MD SB554 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a fee of $1,000 that must be paid to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner for filing the annual statement by an unauthorized insurer applying for approval to become a certified reinsurer; correcting an obsolete reference; repealing an erroneous reference to an accepted insurer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Reinsurers - Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-52) (Y: 87 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 362
2015-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (87-52)
2015-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2015-03-26HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-03-18HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2015-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-13SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-12SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2015-03-10SenateHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback