MD SB56 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a garnishment against property held in a certain joint account is valid unless the persons named on the account were married prior to a certain date; establishing a presumption that the garnishment is valid unless, within 30 days after service of the writ of garnishment on the garnishee, either spouse files a motion objecting to the garnishment and serves a copy of the motion on the judgment creditor, the garnishee, and any other person named on the account; etc.
Title
Civil Actions and Procedures - Garnishments - Spousal Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-11-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |