MD SB56 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 128
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Secretary of Agriculture to provide an exemption from a certain annual licensing requirement to a certain live poultry market operator, production facility operator, or poultry dealer; providing that the Secretary may adopt a certain animal health protection program that is applicable to any live poultry market, production facility, and poultry dealer; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of Agriculture - Regulation of Poultry to Protect Animal Health and Control Avian Influenza

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-1) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-1) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 128
2019-04-05SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-04-05SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-1)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {530713/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-12HouseHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-02-14SenateThird Reading Passed (43-1)
2019-02-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {214334/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-01-09SenateHearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m.
2019-01-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-10-15SenatePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0056&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0056f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0056t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0056e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_128_sb0056e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0056_21433401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/sb0056_53071301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/sb0056.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0056_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0202.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0056_ent.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1343.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1233.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback