MD SB56 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-20 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination provisions for certain provisions of law relating to the eligibility of psychiatrists and psychiatric nurse practitioners who provide Assertive Community Treatment or mobile treatment services to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients in a home or community-based setting through telemedicine to receive reimbursement for the health care services from the Program.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Psychiatrist and Psychiatric Nurse Practitioner Telemedicine Reimbursement - Sunset Termination
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-03-17 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-12-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB191 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Referred Finance
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurse Practitioners
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Virtual Environments
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Home Care Services
Medical Assistance
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Nurse Practitioners
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Virtual Environments
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2018 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2019 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Health - General | 15 | 105.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |