MD SB560 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to notify each school principal of a certain proposed composite score under the education accountability program at least 5 business days before publication of the score on the State Department of Education's website; and requiring the Department to correct a certain published composite score within 5 business days after the identification of a certain error.
Title
School Star Rating Accuracy Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Certifications
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
internet
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Publications
School Administration
Students
Teachers
Time
Curriculum
Data
Demographics
Disclosure
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Examinations
internet
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Publications
School Administration
Students
Teachers
Time