MD SB567 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 52
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations; and requiring the Workgroup to study State child custody court proceedings involving child abuse or domestic violence allegations and make recommendations about how State courts could incorporate in court proceedings the latest science regarding the safety and well-being of children and other victims of domestic violence in interim and final reports to the Governor and General Assembly by December 1, 2019, and June 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workgroup to Study Child Custody Court Proceedings Involving Child Abuse or Domestic Violence Allegations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 52
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-04-08HouseHouse Recede
2019-04-08HouseMotion Recede (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2019-04-08SenateSenators Lee, West, and Cassilly
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-08SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2019-04-08SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
2019-04-04HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments {362914/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-04HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-04-02HouseHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-29HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2019-03-26HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {618476/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0567&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0567f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0567t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_52_sb0567t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0567_61847601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0007/sb0567_36291401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0007/sb0567.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0567_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0764.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0567_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1349.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1521.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback