MD SB57 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that it is not discriminatory, under provisions of law prohibiting specified health insurance policies, contracts, or certificates from discriminating against a person with a mental illness or an emotional, drug, or alcohol abuse disorder, if the benefits for partial hospitalization and outpatient expenses under group contracts covering employees of one or more large employers are covered in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Conformity with Federal Law - Mental Health Benefits,
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2010-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-03-17 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-16 | First Reading Health and Government Operations | |
2010-04-05 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-02-15 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-10 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-01-06 | Hearing 1/20 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Finance | |
2009-09-24 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Discrimination
Diseases
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance Administration
Mental Health
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Women
Diseases
Federal Government
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance Administration
Mental Health
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Women