MD SB57 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-03 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Individual Tax Preparers to impose a civil penalty of up to $5,000 against a person who violates specified provisions of law; requiring the Board to consider specified factors to determine the amount of the penalty; and requiring the Board to pay penalties collected under the Act to the General Fund of the State.
Title
State Board of Individual Tax Preparers - Prohibited Acts - Civil Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2012-11-14 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Preparers
Committees and Commissions
Discipline
Penalties and Sentences
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Preparers