MD SB57 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending for a certain number of years the length of time a county may retain certain revenue from the agricultural land transfer tax for use in certain agricultural land preservation programs; requiring the Department of Planning and the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, in accordance with certain provisions of law, to review any update to a county's comprehensive plan or any other change that may affect a priority preservation area; etc.
Title
Agriculture - County Agricultural Land Preservation Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/22 at 4:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Counties
Land Preservation Trusts
Planning, Department of
Property Tax
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Property
Time
Transfer Tax
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Counties
Land Preservation Trusts
Planning, Department of
Property Tax
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Property
Time
Transfer Tax
Zoning and Planning