MD SB570 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from distributing fentanyl, any structural variation of fentanyl, or any analogue of fentanyl, the use of which is a contributing cause of the death of another; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act; and providing that an individual who lawfully prescribes or administers fentanyl to an individual shall be immune from criminal prosecution for a violation of the Act.
Title
Distribution of Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Bailey [R] | Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Sen. Bob Cassilly [R] | Sen. Jason Gallion [R] |
Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Edward Reilly [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Drugs
Opioids
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Drugs
Opioids
Penalties and Sentences