MD SB570 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing notice of certain easements, covenants, restrictions, and conditions to be recorded in the land records of the county in which the property interest is located; specifying the information required to be provided in the notice; requiring that the notice be indexed for recording; providing that failure to record a notice in accordance with the Act does not impair the rights or interests of the holder of a certain easement, covenant, restriction, or condition or waive, release, or otherwise affect certain obligations; etc.
Title
Real Property - Notice of Easements, Covenants, Restrictions, and Conditions - Recordation
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 566 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {108674/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 3 | 102.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |