MD SB571 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing certain members of a volunteer fire company or rescue squad and certain individuals who are denied payment of a certain disability or death benefit by the Board of Trustees of the Maryland State Firemen's Association to appeal the decision to a certain appeals panel; establishing a certain appeals panel; establishing membership of a certain appeals panel; providing for the retroactive application of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Volunteer Fire Company and Rescue Squads - Member Disability and Death Benefits - Appeals Process

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {677577/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback