MD SB573 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Public Service Commission to establish an energy storage pilot program; providing that the cumulative size of the projects under the program shall be between 5 and 10 megawatts, with a minimum of 15 megawatt-hours; requiring the Commission to require each investor-owned electric company to solicit offers to develop energy storage projects for various commercial and regulatory models; requiring each investor-owned electric company to submit an application for projects from at least two models; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Energy Storage Pilot Project Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-18) (Y: 115 N: 18 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 427
2019-04-08SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (115-18)
2019-04-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12SenateFavorable with Amendments {187077/2 Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback