MD SB574 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Commerce to conduct a study in a certain manner on issues related to federal small business innovation research and technology transfer grants; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations regarding financing options for grant recipients to the General Assembly by December 31, 2019.
Title
Department of Commerce – Small Business Innovation Research and Technology Transfer – Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments {615362/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167774/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Kagan) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {167774/1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Federal Government
Grants
Industry and Technology
Reports
Small Business
Sunset
Commerce, Department of
Economic and Community Development
Federal Government
Grants
Industry and Technology
Reports
Small Business
Sunset