MD SB575 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that, if a court accepts a certain plea agreement with a certain sentence for a defendant charged with committing a crime of violence, the defendant shall serve the sentence imposed without reduction by diminution credits, parole, or otherwise; providing that a court or review panel may not modify a sentence imposed under a plea agreement in accordance with the Act; and altering the eligibility criteria for high-risk offenders for a program of increased supervision while on parole.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Attorneys
Correction, Division of
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Review Boards
State's Attorneys
Violence
Correction, Division of
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pleas
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Review Boards
State's Attorneys
Violence