MD SB579 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing from $1,350,000 to $2,250,000 the maximum amount that the Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority may guarantee a surety under the Small Business Surety Bond Program; and increasing from $1,000,000 to $2,500,000 the maximum amount of specified bonds that the Financing Authority may execute and perform as a surety under its surety program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Small Business Development Financing Authority - Small Business Surety Bond Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-17) (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12SenateVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2015-04-03SenateReturned Passed
2015-04-02HouseThird Reading Passed (122-17)
2015-04-01HouseSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-01HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-01HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2015-03-11HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2015-03-10SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2015-03-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-03-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-03-05SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2015-03-03SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-06SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback