MD SB579 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 675
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable Adopted (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-25SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 675
2017-04-10SenateReturned Passed
2017-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2017-04-10HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-10HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-08HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-04-06HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2017-04-06HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2017-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2017-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted (44-0)
2017-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2017-03-09SenateHearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-02SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0579?ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0579f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/sb/sb0579t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_675_sb0579t.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0579.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0579_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/sb0579_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0579,s-1156&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0579,s-1173&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb0579,h-1530&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback