MD SB579 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Generally curing previous Acts of the General Assembly with possible title defects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Annual Curative Bill

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 7
2019-03-11SenateReturned Passed
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2019-03-06HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-06HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-05HouseFavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-02-26HouseHearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-19HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-02-18SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-02-14SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-02-14SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-02-14SenateFavorable Report by Senate Rules
2019-02-11SenateHearing 2/13 at 11:00 a.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback