MD SB581 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Extending certain benefits under the More Jobs for Marylanders Program to businesses that locate or expand in opportunity zones in the State; establishing the Opportunity Zone Enhancement Program in the Department and providing for the administration of the tax credit enhancements offered by the Program; authorizing an additional tax credit under the historic revitalization tax credit program for certain commercial rehabilitations that qualify as opportunity zone projects; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6) (Y: 126 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 211
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (126-6)
2019-04-05HouseFloor Amendment {493523/2 (Delegate Lafferty) Adopted
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {615969/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-29HouseHearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-28HouseRereferred to Ways and Means
2019-03-28HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {123229/1 (Senator McCray) Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {623828/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFloor Amendment {403223/1 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
2019-03-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {639634/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects

Agriculture
Allegany County
Appropriations
Assessments
Baltimore City
Budgets
Census
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Commercial Rehabilitation
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Comptroller
Contracts
Counties
Cybersecurity
Development Fees and Taxes
Economic and Community Development
Electronic Government
Enterprise Zones
Food
Garrett County
Governor
Grants
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Historical Matters
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Industry and Technology
Investments
Jurisdiction
Laws and Ordinances
Leases and Rent
Loans
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Planning, Department of
Property Tax
Real Property
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Sales and Use Tax
Small Business
Smart Growth
Somerset County
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Taxes - Property
Time
Urban Renewal
Wicomico County
Work, Labor and Employment
Zoning and Planning

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0581&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0581f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0581t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0581e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_211_sb0581e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0581_12322901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0581_40322301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0581_62382801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0581_63963401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0581_61596901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0581_49352302.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0001/sb0581.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0581_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0815.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0581_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1369.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1270.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback