MD SB584 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the limit on the number of call centers that may be approved by 2-1-1 Maryland to provide certain services; repealing certain provisions of law establishing and governing the Health and Human Services Referral Board in the Maryland Department of Health; requiring the Department to conduct a cost analysis that includes a determination regarding the amount of funding needed to support certain 2-1-1 services and to report the findings to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Health and Human Services Referral System - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 295 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587978/1 Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB669 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 294
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Prices
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Examinations
Health
Health, Department of
Prices
Public Health
Public Information
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Social Services
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |