MD SB585 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the Commission on Surrogate Parenting; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; providing that a member of the Commission may not receive compensation but may be reimbursed for specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study specified issues related to surrogate parenting; requiring the Commission to make specified recommendations, if possible; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Title
Commission on Surrogate Parenting
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. George Della [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] |
Sen. Jennie Forehand [D] | Sen. Robert Garagiola [D] | Sen. Larry Haines [R] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-23 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) | |
2010-02-22 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings & Finance | |
2010-02-19 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-12 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0585.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0585f.pdf |