MD SB585 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making specified assertions of patent infringement in bad faith; authorizing a court to consider specified factors as evidence of whether a person has made an assertion of patent infringement in bad faith or in good faith; authorizing specified individuals to bring an action in a specified court to recover for injuries or losses sustained as a result of a violation of the Act; authorizing a court to award damages and remedies under specified circumstances; specifying an exception; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Patent Infringement - Assertions Made in Bad Faith
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 307 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Recede |
2014-04-07 | House | Motion Recede (Delegate Davis) Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senators Astle, Pugh, and Kittleman |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (137-0) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {253799/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-03-07 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {537679/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Claims
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Evidence
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Attorney General
Attorneys' Fees
Civil Actions
Claims
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Court Costs
Courts
Damages
Evidence
Industry and Technology
Investigations and Inquiries
Notices
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology