MD SB585 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Environment and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authorized uses of highway user revenues; repealing obsolete distributions of highway user revenues to Baltimore City, counties, and municipalities for specified fiscal years; requiring that specified additional distributions of highway user revenues be made under specified circumstances to municipalities in fiscal year 2018 for specified purposes; requiring that specified additional distributions of highway user revenues be allocated among municipalities in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution to Municipalities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-18 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-31 | House | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {819532/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Grants
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways
Counties
Grants
Highways
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motor Vehicle Registration
Municipal Corporations
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Transportation - Highways