MD SB586 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the circuit court to provide notice to a child's foster parent, preadoptive parent, or caregiver of the right to request to be designated as a party in a certain proceeding except under certain circumstances; authorizing a court, in its discretion, to grant certain status to certain parties in certain proceedings; requiring a court to grant certain status to certain parties in certain proceedings; etc.
Title
Foster Parents, Preadoptive Parents, and Caregivers – Request to Intervene
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] | Sen. Justin Ready [R] |
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Johnny Salling [R] | Sen. Ronald Young [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-04 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {603129/1 (Senator Salling) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {803123/2 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) Withdrawn |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Floor Amendment {803123/1 (Senator Hayes) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 Adopted |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/27 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Committee Amendment {908276/1 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Waldstreicher) Adopted |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment {908276/1 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/19 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {908276/1 |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB369 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-06 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Subjects
Adoption - see also- Parents and Guardians
Circuit Courts
Education
Family Law
Foster Care
Health
Hearings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Records
Rules and Regulations
Circuit Courts
Education
Family Law
Foster Care
Health
Hearings
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Records
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 3 | 816.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 504 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Family Law | 5 | 525 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |