MD SB590 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Legalizing the 2019 edition of the Code of Public Local Laws of Washington County, being Article 22 of the Code of Public Local Laws of Maryland, published under the direction of the Board of County Commissioners of Washington County; and making provisions for the publication, sale, and distribution of the Code of Public Local Laws of Washington County.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Washington County - Code of Public Local Laws - Legalization

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 124
2019-04-05SenateReturned Passed
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-29HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-03-14SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-12SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-12SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-06SenateHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback