MD SB591 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the amount of qualified business income of the individual deducted under the federal income tax; providing for the continuation of the subtraction modification if the provisions of ยง 199A of the Internal Revenue Code are repealed or terminate; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2018; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Qualified Business Income
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |