MD SB592 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that in Washington County, if approved by the county governing body, a vehicle with a gross maximum weight not exceeding 95,000 pounds may use Warfordsburg Road from the Lanco-Pennland Dairy Cooperative cheese factory located at 14738 Warfordsburg Road to the Maryland-Pennsylvania border.
Title
Washington County - Gross Maximum Vehicle Weight - Warfordsburg Road
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 126 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-04 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Boundaries
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Washington County
Weights and Measures
Highways
Motor Vehicles
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Washington County
Weights and Measures