MD SB599 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the annual salary of the Sheriff of Harford County to be equal to the salary of the Department of State Police lieutenant colonel, at the highest available step for a lieutenant colonel under the Department of State Police pay plan in effect on the day prior to the day that the Sheriff begins a term of office; etc.
Title
Sheriff of Harford County - Salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-2) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1177 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 438
Subjects
Courts and Court Personnel - Local
Harford County
Law Enforcement
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
State Police, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Harford County
Law Enforcement
Salaries and Compensation
Sheriffs
State Police, Department of
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 2 | 326 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |