MD SB6 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a basket of cheer permit in Wicomico County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to grant the permit to certain nonprofit organizations; providing that the permit authorizes the permit holder to provide as a prize at a benefit performance a basket of cheer, consisting of certain alcoholic beverages; specifying that the alcoholic beverages contained in a basket of cheer shall be for off-premises consumption; and setting a fee of $30 or $45 for the permit for holders of certain Class C licenses.
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-11 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-1) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634833/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-11-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Wicomico County
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Nonprofit Organizations
Wicomico County