MD SB60 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Anne Arundel County to adopt a certain ordinance to prohibit littering and to impose certain criminal and civil penalties.
Title
Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 43 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Hearing 1/09 at 2:15 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB77 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Penalties and Sentences
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |