MD SB61 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a claimant to file a claim with the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board electronically in the manner provided under procedures established by the Board.
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Claims - Electronic Filing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 145 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-25 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-10-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Claims
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government