MD SB610 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the governing body of a county to require, by law, the owner or operator of certain solar energy property to pay a certain annual fee to the county; requiring counties to distribute a certain amount of a certain fee to a municipality under certain circumstances; providing for the calculation of the fee; exempting from the personal property tax certain solar energy property; applying the property tax exemption to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Property - Personal Property Tax Exemption and Local Fee Requirement
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Budget and Management, Department of
Comptroller
Counties
Counties - Generally
Exemptions
Fees
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property
Budget and Management, Department of
Comptroller
Counties
Counties - Generally
Exemptions
Fees
Hearings
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Municipal Corporations
Personal Property
Property Tax
Reports
Taxes - Property