MD SB611 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Health and Government Operations
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the minimum age, from 16 years to 12 years, at which a minor has the same capacity as an adult to consent to consultation, diagnosis, and certain treatment of a mental or emotional disorder by a health care provider or clinic; and providing that a health care provider may decide to provide certain information to a certain parent, guardian, or custodian under certain provisions of law unless the health care provider believes that the disclosure will lead to harm to the minor or deter the minor from seeking care.
Title
Health – Mental and Emotional Disorders – Consent
(Mental Health Access Initiative)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 803126/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Floor Amendment 803126/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Favorable with Amendments (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ready) Rejected (Y: 15 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-15) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Floor Amendment {803126/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments (30-15) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Simonaire) Rejected |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Ready) Rejected (15-30) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {117279/1 |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {117279/1 |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB782 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Age
Child Abuse and Neglect
Communications
Disclosure
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Public Health
Safety
Child Abuse and Neglect
Communications
Disclosure
Examinations
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Privacy
Public Health
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 20 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |