MD SB619 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, by May 31, 2019, the Board of Directors of the University of Maryland Medical System Corporation to adopt a certain conflict of interest policy; requiring annual financial disclosures; requiring the Board to ensure that the Corporation continues to be a private, nonprofit, nonstock corporation; altering the composition of, and the appointment process for, the Board; prohibiting inclusion of a State or local elected official; prohibiting a member of the Board from intentionally using the prestige of office for private gain; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

University of Maryland Medical System Corporation – Board of Directors, Ethics, and Audits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 18
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-06HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Kipke) Adopted (133-0)
2019-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {726288/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-04-05HouseRereferred to Health and Government Operations
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03SenateFloor Amendment {183222/1 (Senator Zucker) Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {117372/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-11SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Finance

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0619&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0619f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0619t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0619e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_18_sb0619e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0619_11737201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0619_18322201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0009/sb0619_72628801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0009/sb0619.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0619_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1143.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1474.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1475.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0619_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1345.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback