MD SB62 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Director of the Uninsured Employers' Fund to report, by October 1, 2019, to the Senate Finance Committee, the House Economic Matters Committee, and the Joint Committee on Workers' Compensation Benefit and Insurance Oversight on the solvency of the Fund and whether the General Assembly should adjust or provide authority to adjust a certain assessment; requiring the report to include a discussion of certain payments for compensation to claimants, prospective liabilities, and certain hearing loss claims; etc.
Title
Uninsured Employers’ Fund – Solvency – Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (140-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {483499/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {607070/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-10-26 | Senate | Pre-filed |