MD SB622 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to study and compile information regarding certain matters that relate to certain crime firearms; requiring the Department of State Police to provide certain information for the study; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Governor’s Office of Crime Control and Prevention – Crime Firearms – Study

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 335
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseSpecial Order until 04/04 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {752016/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-03HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments {208677/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-06SenateHearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0622&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0622f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0622t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0622e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_335_sb0622e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0622_20867701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0002/sb0622_75201601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0002/sb0622.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0622_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0586.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0622_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1471.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1390.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback