MD SB633 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Commissioner of Financial Regulation to convene a stakeholder workgroup to develop recommendations for improving certain consumer complaint procedures, holding certain meeting with consumers and representatives of the independent housing counselor industry, and providing training to certain persons regarding complaints against mortgage lenders, originators, and servicers; requiring the Commissioner, in consultation with the stakeholder workgroup, to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Mortgage Lenders, Originators, and Servicers - Workgroup and Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Mortgages
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Commercial Law - Credit Regulation
Committees and Commissions
Financial Institutions
Financial Regulation, Division of
Mortgages
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations