MD SB637 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-13 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a premium finance company to satisfy a debt owed under a premium finance agreement within the preceding 3 years with a refund due under a premium finance agreement with the same company; and requiring that a premium finance agreement to satisfy a debt with a refund must include a certain disclosure.
Title
Insurance – Premium Finance – Refunds and Debts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |