MD SB639 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the pay scale for certain physician positions in a certain facility to be the same as the pay scale for certain psychiatrist positions; requiring certain nursing positions to receive a certain upward adjustment in their pay scales when there is an upward adjustment to the pay scales for initial appointments to certain positions; requiring the pay scale for security attendants at a certain facility to be at least equal to the pay scale for correctional officers; etc.
Title
State Medical, Nursing, and Security Personnel – Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 572 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-03-15 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {967175/1 Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Finance) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1525 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-24 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Motor Vehicle Administration
Nurses
Physicians
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Medical Treatments
Motor Vehicle Administration
Nurses
Physicians
Psychiatrists
Public Health
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Transportation - Generally
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 10 | 415 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 2 | 103.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |