MD SB64 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions relating to the admission in evidence, during certain criminal trials, of a statement offered against a party who caused the unavailability of the declarant of the statement under certain circumstances.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-16 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (42-2) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (127-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {882115/1 Adopted |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {568277/1 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Hearing 1/16 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB40 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |