MD SB643 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering, from 20% to 100%, the percentage of proceeds the Governor is required to appropriate to the Maryland Department of Health from certain proceeds deposited in the General Fund of the State from certain forfeitures for the purpose of funding drug treatment and education programs; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention to include in a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly the total amount deposited in the General Fund from certain forfeitures and how the funds were spent.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture Proceeds - Appropriation Percentage and Reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-2) (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-04-08 | House | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted (131-2) |
2019-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2019-04-01 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Appropriations
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Forfeiture
Governor
Health, Department of
Reports
Substance Abuse
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Forfeiture
Governor
Health, Department of
Reports
Substance Abuse