MD SB645 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain qualified businesses impacted by the construction of the Purple Line light rail project in Montgomery County and Prince George's County a credit against the State income tax and State property tax; requiring the Department of Transportation to determine the eligible amount of the income tax credit; making the income tax credit refundable; requiring the Department to administer the income tax credit; requiring the Department to make determinations and implement processes relevant to certifying qualified businesses; etc.
Title
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Purple Line Construction Zone
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB540 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-18 - Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Comptroller
Income Tax
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Railroads
Records
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Transportation, Department of
Comptroller
Income Tax
Mass Transit
Montgomery County
Prince George's County
Property Tax
Railroads
Records
Rules and Regulations
Taxes - Income
Transportation, Department of
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 751 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0645?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0645f.pdf |