MD SB646 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the circumstances under which certain firefighters, fire fighting instructors, rescue squad members, advanced life support unit members, and sworn members of the Office of the State Fire Marshal are presumed to be suffering from an occupational disease that was suffered in the line of duty and is compensable under the workers' compensation law; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Medical Presumptions for Diseases and Cancer - Eligibility (Firefighter Jesse McCullough's Cancer Protection Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-4) (Y: 130 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-4) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2019-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment {953421/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Motion Returned Second Reading (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {207275/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Death
Disabilities
Diseases
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Health
Occupational Safety
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation
Disabilities
Diseases
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Health
Occupational Safety
Rescue Squads
Work, Labor and Employment
Workers' Compensation