MD SB647 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Elections to maintain a page on its website that includes clear information about voter registration and voting by students enrolled in institutions of higher education, including links to information on voting by absentee ballot for students outside the State; requiring a public institution of higher education to designate a staff member as the student voting coordinator; requiring the student voting coordinator to develop and implement a plan to increase student voter registration; etc.
Title
Election Law - Institutions of Higher Education - Voter Registration and Voting by Students (Student Voter Empowerment Act of 2020)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB245 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Subjects
Ballots
Boundaries
Communications
Community Colleges
Disclosure
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
internet
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Postal Service
Private Schools
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Residency
School Administration
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Transportation
Voting
Boundaries
Communications
Community Colleges
Disclosure
Elections
Elections Supervisors
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
internet
Local Government Mandates
Notices
Postal Service
Private Schools
Public Information
Records
Registration
Reports
Residency
School Administration
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Time
Transportation
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 2 | 303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 3 | 204.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |