MD SB649 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting an increase or decrease in bed capacity from the certificate of need requirement if the change will occur in an intermediate care facility offering residential or intensive substance-related disorder treatment services, or an existing general hospice program, and written notice of the intent to change bed capacity is filed with the Maryland Health Care Commission at least 45 days before increasing or decreasing bed capacity; requiring the Commission to review the State Health plan on Psychiatric Services; Emergency Medical Services; etc.
Title
Health Care Facilities - Change in Bed Capacity - Certificate of Need Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-2) (Y: 133 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 473 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-2) |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-19 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {197373/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospices
Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Committees and Commissions
Emergency Bills
Health Care Commission
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Hospices
Hospitals
Mental and Behavioral Health
Notices
Parents and Guardians