MD SB649 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a custodian of records for the Motor Vehicle Administration to deny inspection by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement of the part of a public record that contains personal information unless the custodian is provided with a valid warrant or valid subpoena issued by a federal court or a court of this State; and requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to annually report certain information to the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2022, and each June 1 thereafter; etc.
Title
Public Information Act – Motor Vehicle Administration – Warrant for Personal Information and Reporting
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Ready) Rejected |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {538474/1 |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Jennings) Adopted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {538474/1 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {538474/1 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB892 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-05 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Courts
Disclosure
Federal Government
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Subpoenas
Warrants
Courts
Disclosure
Federal Government
Identification
Immigrants and Citizenship
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Motor Vehicle Administration
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Subpoenas
Warrants
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 4 | 320 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |