MD SB651 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of regular members of certain local boards of elections from 3 to 5; repealing the position of substitute member of certain local boards; requiring the members of certain local boards to be of certain political parties; requiring that a vacancy on certain local boards be filled in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Election Law - Local Boards of Elections - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {533421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-30) (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {533421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-30) (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 763 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-03-18 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-15 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Floor Amendment {533421/1 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (17-30) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {894534/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {894534/1 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |