MD SB653 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 528
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the county boards of education of Carroll County and Howard County to establish innovative regional schools subject to certain requirements and approval; requiring a memorandum of understanding between the county boards to address the governance, operations, maintenance, and financing of innovative regional schools; requiring the Interagency Commission on School Construction to study and develop a certain cost-share formula; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carroll and Howard County Boards of Education – Establishing Innovative Regional Schools – Authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 528
2019-04-08SenatePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Concur - House Amendments
2019-04-05HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0)
2019-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments {995964/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-05HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-03-19HouseHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-19HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2019-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {244033/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14SenateLaid Over (Senator Washington) Adopted
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments {244033/1
2019-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-15SenateHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-15SenateHearing canceled
2019-02-05SenateHearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=sb0653&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0653f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0653t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/sb/sb0653e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_528_sb0653e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0653_24403301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/sb0653_99596401.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/sb0653.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0653_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0626.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/sb0653_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1370.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1406.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback