MD SB654 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that an immediate successor in interest who has acquired legal title to residential property under a foreclosure shall assume the interest subject to the provision of a notice to vacate and the rights of a bona fide tenant; establishing the circumstances under which a lease or tenancy shall be considered bona fide; altering the contents of notices required to be sent to occupants of residential property in foreclosure; etc.
Title
Real Property - Tenants in Foreclosure - Conforming to Federal Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (106-33) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing 4/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Laid Over (Senator Harris) Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |