MD SB654 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to identify up-to-date, evidence-based, written information about Down Syndrome; requiring the Department to provide the information about Down Syndrome to specified health care facilities and specified health care providers; authorizing specified health care facilities and health care providers to provide specified individuals with specified information under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Health - Down Syndrome - Required Information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 323 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-0) |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Kaiser) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {476883/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-04-01 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {597875/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Counselors
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Electronic Government
Genetics
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Physicians
Public Health
Developmental Disabilities
Education
Electronic Government
Genetics
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Physicians
Public Health